Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Sitjó

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1341AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
13 Oct 1348AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
18 Oct 1351DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Sitjó
Bishop Jaime Sitjó (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 283, and Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast