Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Péter Siklósi

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Feb 1356AppointedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
23 Jan 1376AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
2 Oct 1377AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
1379¹DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Péter Siklósi
Bishop Péter Siklósi (died 1379) Bishop of Veszprém

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 282, and Page 524
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Apr 2021

Quantcast