Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Severini

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1606AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
24 Feb 1606Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
14 Mar 1622AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
20 Dec 1622DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Severini
Archbishop Giovanni Severini (died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,880
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 131
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast