Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Seri-Molini

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1828Born
22 Dec 185527.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187143.2AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
17 Dec 187143.2Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
13 Apr 188859.6DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Seri-Molini (VIAF: 89468936)
Bishop Michele Seri-Molini (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogliano, Archdiocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopJesi, Diocese of Jesi

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 63
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,762

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast