Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Scaglioni

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1519AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
30 Nov 1520Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
1524²ResignedBishop of Aversa, Italy
1 Jul 1524AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
19 Dec 1528³DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Scaglioni
Bishop Antonio Scaglioni (died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPapal, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1520, Number 8
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,448
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast