Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Savoie

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France

Administrator of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1483AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
23 Jul 1484AppointedAdministrator of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
6 Oct 1490DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for François de Savoie
Archbishop François de Savoie (died ) Archbishop of Auch

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 100, and Page 158
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1483, Number 45*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Jul 2021

Quantcast