Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pasteur Cardinal de Sarrats, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1337AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
27 Jan 1339AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
17 Dec 1350AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
17 Dec 1350Elevated to Cardinal
11 Oct 1356DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

MicroData Summary for Pasteur de Sarrats
Pasteur Cardinal de Sarrats O.F.M. (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

EventPlace
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 5.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1350
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 113, and Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Mar 2021

Quantcast