Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanasius Saraff

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1748Born
19 May 179546.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
24 Jun 179546.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
19 Mar 181566.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Athanasius Saraff
Bishop Athanasius Saraff (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiarbekir nell'Armenia Maggiore
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast