Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Santo Domingo

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1311AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en Espaņa)
8 Oct 1326AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
21 Jan 1346DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Santo Domingo
Bishop Juan de Santo Domingo (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 156, and Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Apr 2021

Quantcast