Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John de Sandford, O.S.F. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
30 May 1285AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
7 Apr 1286Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
2 Oct 1294DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John de Sandford
Archbishop John de Sandford O.S.F. (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHoly Trinity, Cathedral, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a bishop for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 97, Number 8,246
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 7 Dec 2020

Quantcast