Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Niccolò Sacchi, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1398AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
26 Jul 1402AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
13 Jan 1408DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Sacchi
Archbishop Niccolò Sacchi O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 411, and Page 412
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast