Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Sabatino (Sabatini)

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1792Born
Oct 1819³27.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 185360.8SelectedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
27 Jun 185361.2ConfirmedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
31 Jul 185361.3Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
10 Mar 186168.9DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Sabatino (Sabatini)
Bishop Giovanni Sabatino (Sabatini) (born , died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagonegro, Diocese of Policastro
Ordained BishopLagonegro, Diocese of Policastro

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 581
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 32
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,859
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast