Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1420AppointedBishop of Cerenzia, Italy
18 Mar 1429AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
23 Dec 1429AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
1433¹DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Rossi
Bishop Tommaso Rossi (died 1433) Bishop of Strongoli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 465, and Page 377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 261
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 May 2021

Quantcast