Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Rossano

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Diocletiana

Rector of the Pontifical Lateran University


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1923Born
29 Jun 194623.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 198259.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
7 Dec 198259.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
7 Dec 198259.6AppointedRector of the Pontifical Lateran University
6 Jan 198359.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
15 Jun 199168.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Rossano
Bishop Pietro Rossano (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVezza d'Alba
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast