Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Le Romain (Romanus)

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Oct 1285SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
10 Feb 1286Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
11 Mar 1296DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Le Romain (Romanus)
Archbishop John Le Romain (Romanus) (died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 233
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 67
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 104
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast