Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Rodríguez Villalón

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1415AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
16 Mar 1418AppointedBishop of León, Spain
28 May 1424DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Rodríguez Villalón
Bishop Juan Rodríguez Villalón (died ) Bishop of León

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 384, and Page 300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Apr 2021

Quantcast