Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Rinuccini

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Nuncio extraordinary)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1592³Born
1624²31.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 162533.0AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
28 Oct 162533.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
Mar 1645³52.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
Jan 1649³56.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
13 Dec 165361.2DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rinuccini (VIAF: 17652994)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Rinuccini (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Error (2)Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopSt. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 188
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 14
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,239
  • op/xxie/loc: CB, 12 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast