Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo da Reggio

Deceased

Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Aug 1348AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
19 Nov 1350AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
12 Sep 1365AppointedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece
1367¹DiedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo da Reggio
Archbishop Angelo da Reggio (died 1367) Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 528, and Page 496
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 May 2021

Quantcast