Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ottobuono di Razzi

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1299AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
29 Apr 1302AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
13 Jan 1315DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottobuono di Razzi
Patriarch Ottobuono di Razzi (died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385, and Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jul 2021

Quantcast