Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Poupet

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Salona


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Feb 1461SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France
27 May 1461ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France
Jun 1462³Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France
14 Jul 1480ResignedBishop of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France
14 Jul 1480AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
16 Mar 1491DiedTitular Bishop of Salona

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Poupet
Bishop Jean de Poupet (died ) Titular Bishop of Salona

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 112, and Page 228
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1462, Number 3
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast