Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruggero de Piazza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jul 1360AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
19 Apr 1363AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
20 Dec 1383DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ruggero de Piazza
Bishop Ruggero de Piazza O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 332, and Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast