Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Piacentini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castello, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Mar 1364AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
13 Jan 1369AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
28 Apr 1371AppointedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece
27 Nov 1375AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Castello, Italy
Dec 1378ResignedBishop of Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Piacentini
Archbishop Giovanni Piacentini , Bishop Emeritus of Castello

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 394, and Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 386, and Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast