Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Petit de Balscot

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Feb 1371AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
10 Mar 1386AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
10 Sep 1400DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Alexander Petit de Balscot
Bishop Alexander Petit de Balscot (died ) Bishop of Meath

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 380, and Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Jul 2021

Quantcast