Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beltramino Paravicini

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Dec 1336AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
24 Nov 1339AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
6 Nov 1340AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
1350¹DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Beltramino Paravicini
Bishop Beltramino Paravicini (died 1350) Bishop of Bologna

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 481, and Page 217
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast