Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Paolo de Tebe

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Administrator of Patrae Veteres (Patras)


Events

DateEventTitle
1345AppointedBishop of Mesched
10 Jul 1345AppointedArchbishop of Smirne, Turkey
15 May 1357AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebennytus
17 Apr 1366AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
20 Oct 1367AppointedAdministrator of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece
1371¹DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Paolo de Tebe
Patriarch Paolo de Tebe (died 1371) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 456, and Page 482
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 206, and Page 445
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast