Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene (Owen) O’Sullivan

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Feb 1739SelectedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
24 Apr 1739ConfirmedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
30 Sep 1743DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Eugene (Owen) O’Sullivan
Bishop Eugene (Owen) O’Sullivan (died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 50
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 109, and Page 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast