Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernat Oliver, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1337AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
12 Jan 1345AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
26 Jun 1346AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
14 Jul 1348DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernat Oliver
Bishop Bernat Oliver O.E.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 128, and Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Apr 2021

Quantcast