Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Filippo Giacinto Olivieri di Vernier

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1739Born
17 Mar 176424.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 178444.6SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
20 Sep 178444.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
21 Nov 1784³45.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
29 Mar 178747.4DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Filippo Giacinto Olivieri di Vernier
Archbishop Angelo Filippo Giacinto Olivieri di Vernier (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVal Salice, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSan Filippo, Church, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Death PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Sassari, Archdiocese of Sassari

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 422
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,052
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 30
  • ob/d/c2/loc: AT, 17 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 May 2021

Quantcast