Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zbigniew z Oleśnicki

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430¹Born
11 Dec 147343.9AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
12 Oct 148151.7AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
2 Feb 149363.0DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zbigniew z Oleśnicki
Archbishop Zbigniew z Oleśnicki (born 1430, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160, and Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1473, Number 52*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast