Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1399SelectedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
24 Dec 1399ConfirmedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
14 May 1404AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò
Bishop Niccolò O.S.B. , Bishop of Isernia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 287, and Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast