Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Nguyễn Văn Bản

Bishop of Hải Phng, Viet Nam

Apostolic Administrator of Ban M Thuột


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1956 Born
16 Sep 199336.8Ordained PriestPriest of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam
21 Feb 200952.2AppointedBishop of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam
12 May 200952.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam
19 Mar 202265.3AppointedBishop of Hải Phng, Viet Nam
19 Mar 202265.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ban M Thuột, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Vincent Nguyễn Văn Bản
(WikiData: Q1518332)
Bishop Vincent Nguyễn Văn Bản (born ) Bishop of Hải Phng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuy Ho
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ban M Thuột, Diocese of Ban M Thuột

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hải Phng.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,171
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024