Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni di Naso, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 May 1348AppointedBishop of Melfi, Italy
27 Jul 1349AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
13 Oct 1350AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
3 Aug 1361DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni di Naso
Bishop Giovanni di Naso O.P. (died ) Bishop of Bologna

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 523, and Page 141
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast