Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchor de Moscoso y Sandoval

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1624SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
29 May 1624ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
1 Sep 1632DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Melchor de Moscoso y Sandoval
Bishop Melchor de Moscoso y Sandoval (died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,835
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 310
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 146, Number 930
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 60
  • d: CB, 24 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast