Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ogerio Moriset

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1411AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
11 Feb 1433AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
11 Jan 1441DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for Ogerio Moriset
Bishop Ogerio Moriset (died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConflans

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast