Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Middleton

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Feb 1278AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
29 May 1278Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
1 Sep 1288DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Middleton
Bishop William Middleton (died ) Bishop of Norwich

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 462
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 65
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Aug 2021

Quantcast