Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Mezzavacca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rieti, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350Born
16 Jun 137424.4AppointedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
Apr 137828.2AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
18 Sep 137828.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 137828.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
1380²30.0ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
20 Jul 1396²46.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Rieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Mezzavacca
Bartolomeo Cardinal Mezzavacca (born 1350, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rieti

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Patriarchal Liberian, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 416, and Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Jun 2021

Quantcast