Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Garcia de Menezes (Roderici)

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jul 1418AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
25 Jun 1421AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
10 Apr 1426AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
1430¹DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Garcia de Menezes (Roderici)
Bishop Garcia de Menezes (Roderici) (died 1430) Bishop of Viseu

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 532, and Page 291
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jun 2021

Quantcast