Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Meli

Bishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1962 Born
24 Nov 199129.3Ordained PriestPriest of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
5 Feb 201855.5AppointedBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
25 Apr 201855.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
21 Sep 201957.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Aitape, Papua New Guinea
26 Sep 202159.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Aitape, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Francis Meli
Bishop Francis Meli (born ) Bishop of Vanimo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoi Island, Archdiocese of Rabaul
Ordained BishopTown Oval, Vanimo, Diocese of Vanimo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vanimo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2018
  • ob.loc: CB, 27 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,769
  • aadm: CB, 22 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Sep 2021

Quantcast