Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Mauclerc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Oct 1223AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
7 Dec 1224Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 1246ResignedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 1248DiedBishop Emeritus of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Mauclerc
Bishop Walter Mauclerc (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carlisle

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 56
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 232
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,811

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast