Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joannice Massamiri

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jan 1860AppointedAuxiliary Bishop
6 Jan 1860Ordained BishopTitular Bishop
5 Dec 1864Converted
14 Jan 1865ConfirmedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
1866²AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
1878²ResignedPatriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
1881²AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
13 Sep 1882DiedPatriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannice Massamiri
Archbishop Joannice Massamiri (died ) Patriarchal Vicar of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamascus
Ordained BishopDamascus
Death PlaceDamascus

  • a bishop for 22.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,791
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 38
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,334
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,738
  • b: CB, 28 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast