Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Massaro

Bishop-Elect of Avezzano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1967 Born
5 Dec 199225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Andria, Italy
23 Jul 202154.0AppointedBishop of Avezzano, Italy
21 Sep 202154.2Ordained BishopBishop of Avezzano, Italy
3 Oct 202154.2InstalledBishop of Avezzano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Massaro
Father Giovanni Massaro (born ) Bishop-Elect of Avezzano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndria, Diocese of Andria
Ordained PriestCathedral, Andria, Diocese of Andria
Ordained BishopPiazza Vittorio Emanuele II, Andria, Diocese of Andria

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Avezzano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2021
  • c1: CB, 23 Jul 2021
  • ob/i: CB, 4 Aug 2021
  • c2+: CB, 28 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Aug 2021

Quantcast