Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Martínez de Ágreda

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Oct 1313AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
1 Oct 1322AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
19 Jan 1335AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
1344²DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Martínez de Ágreda
Bishop Fernando Martínez de Ágreda (died 1344) Bishop of Badajoz

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 383, and Page 263
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Jun 2021

Quantcast