Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Marshall

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Feb 1194AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
27 Mar 1194Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
1 Nov 1206DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Marshall
Bishop Henry Marshall (died ) Bishop of Exeter

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 52
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 368
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast