Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Malipiero, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1427AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
16 Jun 1428AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Castello, Italy
12 May 1433AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vicenza, Italy
8 Jun 1451DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Malipiero
Archbishop Francesco Malipiero O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Vicenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 460, and Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 May 2021

Quantcast