Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Barnaba Malaspina

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Feb 1363AppointedBishop of Luni, Italy
31 Jan 1374AppointedAdministrator of Penne e Atri, Italy
1378¹ResignedBishop of Luni, Italy
Mar 1380³AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
7 Nov 1380DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Barnaba Malaspina
Archbishop Barnaba Malaspina (died ) Archbishop of Pisa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 400, and Page 394
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jun 2021

Quantcast