Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Maria di San Agostino (Camillo Apollonio) Malachisi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ispahan, Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1688Born
27 Mar 170718.4ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
11 Aug 173243.8AppointedBishop of Ispahan, Iran
23 Jun 173647.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ispahan, Iran
13 Aug 174960.8DiedBishop of Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Filippo Maria di San Agostino (Camillo Apollonio) Malachisi
Bishop Filippo Maria di San Agostino (Camillo Apollonio) Malachisi O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Ispahan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMisaglia, Italy
Ordained BishopAlep

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 102
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,691
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 21
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast