Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raymond Cardinal Mairose

Deceased

Bishop of Castres, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jul 1423AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
14 Jan 1426AppointedBishop of Castres, France
24 May 1426Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 1426AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
21 Oct 1427DiedBishop of Castres, France

MicroData Summary for Raymond Mairose
Raymond Cardinal Mairose (died ) Bishop of Castres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMillau, Diocese of Rodez
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Prassede, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 390, and Page 173
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast