Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnau de Lordac (Lordato)

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1326AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
3 Oct 1341AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
3 May 1346DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Arnau de Lordac (Lordato)
Bishop Arnau de Lordac (Lordato) (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 223, and Page 510

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast