Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro López de Miranda

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1438AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
11 Oct 1443AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
29 Oct 1453DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro López de Miranda
Bishop Pedro López de Miranda (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Death PlaceSanto Domingo de la Calzada

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 114, and Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Apr 2021

Quantcast