Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugues de La Jugié

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1349AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
27 Jun 1371AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
13 Jul 1371DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Hugues de La Jugié
Bishop Hugues de La Jugié (died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 166, and Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast